EP3624293 - METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR OPERATING A STATIONARY, ELECTRIC ENERGY STORAGE THAT IS PROVIDED FOR AN ELECTRIC CONSUMPTION UNIT, LIKE, E.G., A HOUSEHOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2021/44] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arslan, Eren Ridlerstraße 8 80339 München / DE | 02 /
Bogen, Michelle 325 Walker Drive Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
Maul, Lukas Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 98 81739 München / DE | 04 /
van Triel, Florian Dorfstr. 71 40882 Ratingen / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18193860.6 | 11.09.2018 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624293 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3624293 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/32, H02J3/38 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP,CN,US);
H02J3/28 (CN);
H02J13/00007 (US);
H02J3/008 (CN);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (US);
G06Q40/04 (US);
G06Q50/06 (US);
H02J2300/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2020/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINES STATIONÄREN SPEICHERS FÜR ELEKTRISCHEN STROM FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE VERBRAUCHSEINHEIT, WIE Z. B. FÜR DEN HAUSHALT | [2020/12] | English: | METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR OPERATING A STATIONARY, ELECTRIC ENERGY STORAGE THAT IS PROVIDED FOR AN ELECTRIC CONSUMPTION UNIT, LIKE, E.G., A HOUSEHOLD | [2020/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE STATIONNAIRE QUI EST PRÉVU POUR UNE UNITÉ DE CONSOMMATION ÉLECTRIQUE, PAR EXEMPLE, UN APPAREIL MÉNAGER | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 24.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2018 | AL | 03.11.2021 | AT | 03.11.2021 | CY | 03.11.2021 | CZ | 03.11.2021 | DK | 03.11.2021 | EE | 03.11.2021 | ES | 03.11.2021 | FI | 03.11.2021 | HR | 03.11.2021 | IT | 03.11.2021 | LT | 03.11.2021 | LV | 03.11.2021 | MC | 03.11.2021 | NL | 03.11.2021 | PL | 03.11.2021 | RO | 03.11.2021 | RS | 03.11.2021 | SE | 03.11.2021 | SI | 03.11.2021 | SK | 03.11.2021 | SM | 03.11.2021 | BG | 03.02.2022 | NO | 03.02.2022 | GR | 04.02.2022 | IS | 03.03.2022 | PT | 03.03.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.09.2018 | |
AL | 03.11.2021 | ||
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
IT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
AT | 03.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
CZ | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RO | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
NL | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
ES | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
PL | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
PT | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 03.11.2021 | |
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 03.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013282193 (TYAGI RAJESH [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] *; | [Y]US9727898 (PARK DANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-8* column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 55 *; | [Y]US2018144414 (LEE JA-CHIN AUDREY [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1-12 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0188] * |