EP3623267 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING A FIRST COMPONENT AND A SECOND COMPONENT OF A PEDESTRIAN AND/OR GOODS TRANSPORT MEANS RELATIVE TO EACH OTHER, AND PASSENGER AND/OR GOODS TRANSPORT MEANS WITH SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motherson Innovations Company Limited 1 Bartholomew Lane London EC2N 2AX / GB | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Motherson Innovations Company Limited 1 Bartholomew Lane London EC2N 2AX / GB | ||
For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | |||
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Motherson Innovations Company Limited 35 Great St. Helen's London EC3A 6AP / GB | ||
For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Eric Neunlindenstr. 26 79106 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Bleile, Claus Baslerstr. 86 79227 Schallstadt / DE | 03 /
Gut, Dieter Furtmatten 22 79235 Vogtsburg-Oberbergen / DE | 04 /
Diez Herrera, Victor Samuntada 16 bajos 08203 Sabadell (Barcelona) / ES | 05 /
Ammann, Thiemo Brühlgasse 2 67806 Rockenhausen / DE | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18194099.0 | 12.09.2018 | [2020/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623267 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3623267 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/14] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3623267 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/02, B62D65/16 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B62D65/024 (EP);
F16B7/00 (CN);
B62D65/026 (US);
B62D25/085 (CN);
B62D27/065 (CN);
B62D65/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2020/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSTELLEN EINES ERSTEN BAUTEILS UND EINES ZWEITEN BAUTEILS EINES PERSONEN- UND/ODER GÜTERTRANSPORTMITTELS RELATIV ZUEINANDER, SOWIE PERSONEN- UND/ODER GÜTERTRANSPORTMITTEL MIT EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/12] | English: | DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING A FIRST COMPONENT AND A SECOND COMPONENT OF A PEDESTRIAN AND/OR GOODS TRANSPORT MEANS RELATIVE TO EACH OTHER, AND PASSENGER AND/OR GOODS TRANSPORT MEANS WITH SUCH A DEVICE | [2020/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE D'UN PREMIER COMPOSANT ET D'UN DEUXIÈME COMPOSANT D'UN MOYEN DE TRANSPORT DES PERSONNES ET / OU DES MARCHANDISES RELATIVES LES UNES AUX AUTRES AINSI QUE MOYEN DE TRANSPORT DES PERSONNES ET / OU DES MARCHANDISES DOTÉ D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2020/12] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 25.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2018 | AL | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | IE | 12.09.2022 | LU | 12.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.09.2018 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 12.09.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 12.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 06.04.2022 | |
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19612479 (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]) [A] 1-19* column 1, line 24 - column 4, line 21; figure -; claim - *; | [IA]EP1491401 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [I] 1,2,19 * paragraphs [0004] - [0047]; figure -; claim - * * figures 10,12A,12B * [A] 3-18; | [XA]US2005023864 (LAZZERONI ERIC [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,14,19 * Fig.3,4,5 - drehbarer Versteller pos.91, verschiebbarer Grundkörper pos.60, Stellkörper pos.65, Fixierelement pos.87; paragraphs [0005] - [0086]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3-13,15-18; | [A]FR2973326 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-19 * Fig.4; page 2, line 18 - page 7, line 14; figure -; claim - *; | [AD]EP2683596 (FAURECIA EXTERIORS GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-19 * Fig.4a,8a; paragraphs [0005] - [0062]; figure -; claim - *; | [XA]EP2873591 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR]) [X] 1,2,12,19 * Fig.1,2 - Verstellelement pos.10, Stellkörper pos.25, GRundkörper pos.21, Fixiereinrichtung par.45 pos.34; paragraphs [0005] - [0047]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3-11,13-18; | [A]DE102016014120 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS LLC [US]) [A] 1-19 * Fig.2 - Verstellelement pos.20 wird entnommen; paragraphs [0003] - [0039]; figure -; claim - * | Examination | EP2683596 | by applicant | EP2683596 |