EP3467426 - ACTIVE ISOLATION FOR SEEKER OPTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosemount Aerospace Inc. 14300 Judicial Road Burnsville, MN 55306-4898 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHAM, Jason 15200 Wood Duck Trail NW Prior Lake, MN 55372 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18194191.5 | 13.09.2018 | [2019/15] | Priority number, date | US201715709852 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: US201715709852 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467426 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F41G7/22, G02B7/02, G02B27/64, H01L41/08, F16F15/00 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G02B27/646 (EP,US);
F16F15/005 (EP,US);
F41G7/2293 (EP,US);
G02B13/0045 (US);
G02B7/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] |
Former [2019/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVE ISOLIERUNG FÜR SUCHEROPTIK | [2019/15] | English: | ACTIVE ISOLATION FOR SEEKER OPTICS | [2019/15] | French: | ISOLATION ACTIVE POUR OPTIQUE DE CHERCHEUR | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 10.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005258338 (BAUMGART JORG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2008217465 (FACCIANO ANDREW B [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2011226955 (LUTY CLIFFORD J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052]; figure 6c ** paragraph [0058] *; | [Y]USH2265H (FOUSE TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [Y] 2,6 * column 4, line 9 - line 12 *; | [Y]US2012138728 (BRUNTON DANIEL W [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2016092081 (BRÜEL & KJÆR SOUND & VIBRATION MEASUREMENT AS [DK]) [Y] 4,7 * page 1, line 3 - page 2, line 6 *; | [Y]EP3205972 (ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1,2 * |