Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474108

EP3474108 - AUTONOMOUS DRIVING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HASHIMOTO, Ryuta
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18194320.013.09.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateJP2017019703110.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017197031
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474108
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/00, B60W50/14
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM AUTONOMEN FAHREN[2019/17]
English:AUTONOMOUS DRIVING SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT AUTONOME[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2016113926  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [I] 1-9 * EP3246892 A1 considered for the sake of translation; paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0019] , [0028] - [0037] - [0219]; figures 2,4 *;
 [A]WO2017056224  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-9 * EP3357782 A1 considered for the sake of translation; paragraphs [0037] - [0041] - [0045] , [0050] , [0076] , [0077]; figures 9,10 *;
 [A]US2014156133  (CULLINANE BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0026] , [0028] *
by applicantJP2013544695