Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470996

EP3470996 - PREDICTING ELECTROSTATIC CHARGES IN A LIQUID CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WESTIN, Benjamin A.
100 North Riverside Plaza
CHCAGO, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
02 / OLSON, Travis G.
100 North Riverside Plaza
CHCAGO, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18194392.914.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20171578248512.10.2017         Original published format: US201715782485
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3470996
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3470996
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORHERSAGE VON ELEKTROSTATISCHEN LADUNGEN IN EINEM FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER[2019/16]
English:PREDICTING ELECTROSTATIC CHARGES IN A LIQUID CONTAINER[2019/16]
French:PRÉDICTION DE CHARGES ÉLECTROSTATIQUES DANS UN CONTENEUR DE LIQUIDE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Documents cited:Search[I]  - Flow Science Inc., "Electric charge distribution - FLOW-3D", (20101027), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=nNWJiK0gv0Y, (20190319), XP055570904 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure: electric charge density * * paragraph [0001] *
 [Y]  - MARTIN MOCILAN ET AL, "Dynamic Analysis of Fuel Tank", PROCEDIA ENGINEERING, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160101), vol. 136, doi:10.1016/j.proeng.2016.01.172, ISSN 1877-7058, pages 45 - 49, XP055570898 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 46, paragraph 2 * * figures 6-9 * * page 48, paragraph 2 * * page 49, paragraphs 3,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.proeng.2016.01.172
 [Y]  - Ulrich Von Pidoll, "Worst case conditions for electrostatic tests of liquid handling systems", Journal of Electrostatics, doi:10.1016/j.elstat.2012.10.004, (20130201), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://www.unece.org/fileadmin/DAM/trans/doc/2003/wp29grsg/TRANS-WP29-GRSG-84-inf02e.pdf, (20190319), XP055570774 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 1; figure 4 * * page 8, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elstat.2012.10.004