Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470262

EP3470262 - TRACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
20.09.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - designated statespublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kubota Corporation
2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome
Naniwa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / TAMURA, Yoshiyuki
c/o Kubota Corporation
Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukita
Sakai-ku, Sakai-city
Osaka, 5900823 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18194541.114.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2017019701910.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017197019
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470262
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60N3/02, B60Q1/26, B60R1/06, B62D25/16
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/43]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAKTOR[2019/16]
English:TRACTOR[2019/16]
French:TRACTEUR[2019/16]
Examination procedure06.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/43]
12.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[IAY]JPS57195929U  (.) [I] 1,2 * figures 1-5 * [A] 3,6 [Y] 4,5;
 [IAY]CN201670273U  (SHANGHAI NEW HOLLAND AGRICULTURE MACHINERY CO LTD) [I] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,6 [Y] 4,5;
 [A]US2015246641  (JAYAPALAN SARAVANAN [IN], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
by applicantJP2017114328
 JP2013139229