Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473922

EP3473922 - LIGHT PROJECTION DEVICE FOR MIXING MULTIPLE LIGHT SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BURGESS, Michael J.
100 North Riverside Plaza
CHICAGO, IL 60606-2016 / US
02 / VALENTINE, William H. JR.
100 North Riverside Plaza
CHICAGO, IL 60606-2016 / US
03 / MA, Jing
100 North Riverside Plaza
CHICAGO, IL 60606-2016 / US
04 / WILCYNSKI, Paul J.
100 North Riverside Plaza
CHICAGO, IL 60606-2016 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18194690.616.09.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171578321513.10.2017         Original published format: US201715783215
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473922
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F21V8/00, G02B5/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LICHTPROJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN MEHRERER LICHTQUELLEN[2019/17]
English:LIGHT PROJECTION DEVICE FOR MIXING MULTIPLE LIGHT SOURCES[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION DE LUMIÈRE PERMETTANT DE MÉLANGER DE MULTIPLES SOURCES DE LUMIÈRE[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP2177816  (ROBE LIGHTING SRO [CZ]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * figures 4,6,7 * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0031] * [A] 3,4