Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469972

EP3469972 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHARGING AN ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE FOR USE IN A CLEANING IMPLEMENT AND CLEANING IMPLEMENT WITH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Miele & Cie. KG
Carl-Miele-Straße 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Agethen, Michael
Borlefzener Kirchweg 69
32602 Vlotho / DE
02 / Buchholz, Thomas
Wilhelmstraße 14
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
 [2019/16]
Application number, filing date18194695.517.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateDE20171012366511.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017123665
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469972
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A47L5/00, A47L9/00, A47L9/28
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/19]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LADEN EINER ENERGIESPEICHEREINRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM REINIGUNGSGERÄT UND REINIGUNGSGERÄT MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHARGING AN ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE FOR USE IN A CLEANING IMPLEMENT AND CLEANING IMPLEMENT WITH A DEVICE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CHARGE D'UN DISPOSITIF ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE ET APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE DOTÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF[2019/16]
Examination procedure28.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/19]
28.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[X]US2017071431  (REED BRETT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]KR20090115526  (WOONGJIN COWAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013]; claims 1,4 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [X]EP3185096  (XIAOMI INC [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0087] *;
 [I]US2012158915  (HAM JONG-GYU [KR], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0078]; figures 1-6 *