Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466596

EP3466596 - METHODS OF MANUFACTURING OF A CONFORMABLE HIGH PRESSURE FLUID VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.06.2019Change - classificationpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.06.2019Change - classificationpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
4 Coliseum Centre
2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHAO, Wenping
102 Gates Farm Rd.
Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US
02 / SUN, Ellen Y.
17 Summerwind Drive
South Windsor, CT Connecticut 06074 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date18194813.417.09.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS20171570611715.09.2017         Original published format: US201715706117
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3466596
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3466596
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:B23K20/12, B23K20/22, F17C1/14, // B23K101/12, B23K103/00, B23K103/16
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ANPASSUNGSFÄHIGEN HOCHDRUCK-FLÜSSIGKIET-BEHÄLTERS[2019/15]
English:METHODS OF MANUFACTURING OF A CONFORMABLE HIGH PRESSURE FLUID VESSEL[2019/15]
French:METHODES DE FABRICATION D'UN RÉCIPIENT POUR FLUIDE SOUS HAUTE PRESSION CONFORMABLE[2019/15]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2016290564  (CROTEAU PAUL F [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0029] , [0031]; figure - * [Y] 2,4;
 [Y]KR20100113865  (KOREA ITO CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0028]; figure 2 *;
 [YA]US5697511  (BAMPTON CLIFFORD C [US]) [Y] 4 * column 3, lines 1-27; figure - * [A] 5-7;
 [XY]JP2005155776  (CHUO MOTOR WHEEL CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0083] - [0087]; figure 14 * [Y] 4-7;
 [Y]US2007158343  (SHIMADA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4-7 * paragraphs [0048] - [0052]; figure - *;
 [A]EP3073174  (GOODRICH CORP [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0020]; figure - *