Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470335

EP3470335 - COMPLIANT STRUCTURE DESIGN FOR VARYING SURFACE CONTOURS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flexsys, Inc.
2006 Hogback Road, Suite 7
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HETRICK, Joel A.
2650 Daleview Drive
Ann Arbor, MI Michigan 48105 / US
02 / ERVIN, Gregory F.
29466 Brown Court
Garden City, MI Michigan 48135 / US
03 / KOTA, Sridhar
2256 Gray Fox Court
Ann Arbor, MI Michigan 48103 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18195462.927.04.2007
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20060795956P27.04.2006         Original published format: US 795956 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470335
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B64C27/615, // B64C27/72, B64C3/44
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ANPASSBARE STRUKTURGESTALTUNG FÜR UNTERSCHIEDLICHE OBERFLÄCHENKONTUREN[2019/16]
English:COMPLIANT STRUCTURE DESIGN FOR VARYING SURFACE CONTOURS[2019/16]
French:CONCEPTION DE STRUCTURE ADAPTATIVE POUR FAIRE VARIER DES CONTOURS DE SURFACE[2019/16]
Examination procedure04.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07815105.7  / EP2021243
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US3215370  (LOUIS STRYDOM LLEWELLYN) [X] 1,6,7 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 72; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3-5 [I] 2,8,9;
 [Y]GB2042996  (DORNIER GMBH) [Y] 3-5 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 24; figures 1, 2 *;
 [XI]US3179357  (LYON DONALD G) [X] 1 * The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figures 2-4 * [I] 2-4,6-9;
 [X]US5639215  (YAMAKAWA EIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 2B *;
 [X]US3994452  (COLE JAMES B) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2749060  (BRADY KEITH G, et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US6273681  (YAMAKAWA EIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 *;
 [XI]DE102004045651  (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 17 * [I] 2;
 [X]US4113210  (PIERCE DONALD) [X] 1 * The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figures 1a, 1b, 2-5 *;
 [X]US6932569  (TOROK MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 50 - column 11, line 14; figures 2B, 8, 9A-9C, 10, 11 *;
 [A]US6168379  (BAUER KARL [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figures 3, 4 *