Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473289

EP3473289 - BREATHING ASSISTANCE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited
15 Maurice Paykel Place
East Tamaki
1706 Auckland / NZ
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]For all designated states
Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited
15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki
1706 Auckland / NZ
Inventor(s)01 / MCAULEY, Alastair Edwin
58A Ngaphui Road Remuera
1005 Auckland / NZ
02 / MILIVOJEVIC, Ivan
9 Bardia Street Belmont
1309 Auckland / NZ
03 / SHOTBOLT, Aidan Mark
168 Gladstone Road Dalmore
9001 Dunedin / NZ
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cornford, James Robert
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18195537.830.03.2005
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateNZ2004053210802.04.2004         Original published format: NZ 53210804
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473289
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/06, A61M16/00, // A61M16/16
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER ATMUNG[2019/17]
English:BREATHING ASSISTANCE APPARATUS[2019/17]
French:APPAREIL D'ASSISTANCE A LA RESPIRATION[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05728190.9  / EP1737524
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
19.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
29.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2003089373  (GRADON LEWIS GEORGE [NZ] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-9,14,15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 10-13;
 [X]US6016804  (GLEASON COLIN M [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,15 * column 2, line 50 - column 5, line 14; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]WO0162326  (MAP GMBH [DE]; MELIDIS PARIS [DE]; LAUBOECK THEODOR [DE]) [X] 1-4,15 * page 11, line 25 - page 22, line 16; figures 1-13 *;
 [X]US2003019496  (KOPACKO RALPH E [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US4907584  (MCGINNIS GERALD E [US]) [X] 1,2,15 * column 5, line 41 - column 8, line 53; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]EP1258266  (TIARA MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 10-13 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-9 *
by applicantUS5243971
 US6112746
 US5570689
 WO0078384
 NZ528029