Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3460923

EP3460923 - PANEL MOUNT ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH MOISTURE RESISTANT MATING FACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
27.09.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
27.09.2019Change - designated statespublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2019/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Yi, Chung Hun
1024 Tiverton Road
Mechanicsburg, PA 17050 / US
02 / Morris, Tom
2221 Suncrest Village Lane
Johnson City, TN 37615 / US
 [2019/13]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2019/13]
Application number, filing date18195684.820.09.2018
[2019/13]
Priority number, dateUS20171571238722.09.2017         Original published format: US201715712387
[2019/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3460923
Date:27.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/52, H01R13/74, H02G3/12, H02G3/14
[2019/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/44]
Former [2019/13]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TAFELMONTIERTER ELEKTRISCHER STECKER MIT FEUCHTIGKEITSBESTÄNDIGER STECKSEITE[2019/13]
English:PANEL MOUNT ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH MOISTURE RESISTANT MATING FACE[2019/13]
French:CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE À MONTAGE EN PANNEAU AVEC FACE D'ACCOUPLEMENT RÉSISTANT À L'HUMIDITÉ[2019/13]
Examination procedure23.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/44]
23.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2010010031  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * pages 4-8; figures 1-5 * [I] 4,5,7,8;
 [A]US5248196  (LYNN SHELBY A [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]CN101865584  (BSH HOME APPLIANCES CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1950513  (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]CN204011942U  (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]DE10113602  (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]CN201478584U  (LIJIANG SHEN) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009121598  (KANG DAE-KIL [KR]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]KR20130064837  (HANKOOK PREC CO LTD [KR]) [A] 7 * abstract *