Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469884

EP3469884 - SQUARE BALER COMPRISING OSCILLATING SIDEWALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
25.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Gresch, Valentin
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG, c/o Global IP Services
John-Deere-Str. 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Holst, Sönke
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Mannheim Regional Center
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18195714.320.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateDE20171021722127.09.2017         Original published format: DE102017217221
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469884
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A01F15/04, A01F15/08
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:QUADERBALLENPRESSE MIT IN EINE SCHWINGUNG VERSETZBAREN SEITENWÄNDEN[2019/16]
English:SQUARE BALER COMPRISING OSCILLATING SIDEWALLS[2019/16]
French:PRESSE À BALLES RECTANGULAIRES POURVUE DE PAROIS LATÉRALLES POUVANT ÊTRE ENTRAÎNÉES DANS UN MOUVEMENT D'OSCILLATION[2019/16]
Examination procedure17.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
17.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2022319  (CLAAS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1795065  (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0037] *;
 [A]EP0273067  (HESSTON CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,3,4 * * column 4, line 34 - column 10, line 28 *
by applicantEP0346586
 EP0803183
 US2016088798
 DE10351861
 WO2011039140