Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466633

EP3466633 - HIGH-PERFORMANCE WORKPIECE HEATING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2019Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / NELSON, Karl M.
THE BOEING COMPANY
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606 / US
02 / THOMPSON, Megan
THE BOEING COMPANY
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606 / US
03 / SERENCSITS, William
THE BOEING COMPANY
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606 / US
04 / WU, Tateh
THE BOEING COMPANY
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606 / US
05 / RIEDEL, Brian
THE BOEING COMPANY
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18195755.620.09.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS20171571618826.09.2017         Original published format: US201715716188
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466633
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B29C35/04, F27B17/00
[2019/23]
Former International [2019/15]B29C35/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGSSTARKES WERKSTÜCKHEIZSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2019/15]
English:HIGH-PERFORMANCE WORKPIECE HEATING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHAUFFAGE DE PIÈCE À USINER HAUTE PERFORMANCE[2019/15]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
deletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
20.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012003597  (MASON DAVE [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1A-8 *;
 [A]US9056413  (COX GORDON M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 8 - line 35 * * column 4, line 21 - column 7, line 33 * * figures 2-9 *;
 [A]US2016348976  (NELSON KARL MARIUS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0129] * * figures 3-21 *;
 [A]GB2416326  (AEROFORM GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 6 - page 6, line 2 * * figure . *