blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3466633 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3466633



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 457
17.10.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.10.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.10.2019 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
01.10.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.10.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
01.10.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 60
16.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.09.2019 Claims Search / examination 5
16.09.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
16.09.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
16.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.09.2019 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.05.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.05.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
20.05.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 60
30.04.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.04.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
15.04.2019 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
14.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
20.11.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 85
20.09.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
20.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
20.09.2018 Description Search / examination 37
20.09.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
20.09.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 Drawings Search / examination 21
20.09.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5