blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3466633
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10369755Global Dossier 06.08.2019B2
US2019091952 28.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715716188 26.09.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA3010937Global Dossier 26.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715716188 26.09.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3466633Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715716188 26.09.2017