Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468124

EP3468124 - HIGH-SPEED SIGNALING SYSTEMS WITH ADAPTABLE PRE-EMPHASIS AND EQUALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Zerbe, Jared L.
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
02 / Chen, Fred F.
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
03 / Ho, Andrew
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
04 / Farjad-Rad, Ramin
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
05 / Poulton, John W.
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
06 / Donnelly, Kevin S.
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
07 / Lebowitz, Brian
Rambus Inc.
1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18195857.020.01.2006
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS200564582305P20.01.2005         Original published format: US 64582305 P
US200568675405P01.06.2005         Original published format: US 68675405 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468124
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/03, H04L7/033, H04L1/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2019/15]
TitleGerman:HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSSIGNALSYSTEME MIT ANPASSBARER PRÄEMPHASE UND ENTZERRUNG[2019/15]
English:HIGH-SPEED SIGNALING SYSTEMS WITH ADAPTABLE PRE-EMPHASIS AND EQUALIZATION[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈMES DE SIGNALISATION À GRANDE VITESSE À ÉGALISATION ET PRÉACCENTUATION ADAPTABLES[2019/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06718942.3  / EP1856869
EP11170405.2  / EP2375661
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004203559  (STOJANOVIC VLADIMIR M [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 4, paragraph 59 - paragraph 61 * * page 21, paragraph 156 - page 22, paragraph 162 * * figures 3,41 *;
 [XI]US2004022311  (ZERBE JARED L [US], et al) [X] 1,4,10 * page 2, paragraph 41 * * page 2, paragraph 45 - page 4, paragraph 53 * * page 5, paragraph 58 - paragraph 60 * * page 6, paragraph 64 * * page 6, paragraph 67 - paragraph 69 * * figures 3,6,9 * [I] 3,5-9,11-15;
 [A]US6751255  (REUVEN ILAN [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 * * column 4, line 27 - line 31 * * column 6, line 19 - line 48 *;
 [A]  - ZERBE J L ET AL, "Equalization and clock recovery for a 2.5-10-Gb/s 2-PAM/4-PAM backplane transceiver cell", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS IEEE USA, (200312), vol. 38, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 2121 - 2130, XP002397672 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2003.818572
 [A]  - STOJANOVIC V ET AL, "Adaptive equalization and data recovery in a dual-mode (PAM2/4) serial link transceiver", 2004 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI CIRCUITS. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS (IEEE CAT. NO.04CH37525) WIDERKEHR AND ASSOCIATES GAITHERSBURG, MD, USA, (2004), ISBN 0-7803-8287-0, pages 348 - 351, XP002384674 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - FADAD-RAD I R ET AL, "0.622-8.0Gbps 150mw serial 10 macrocell with fully flexible preemphasis and equalization", 2003 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI CIRCUITS. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. KYOTO, JAPAN, JUNE 12 - 14, 2003, SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI CIRCUITS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030612), ISBN 4-89114-034-8, pages 63 - 66, XP010651096 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VLSIC.2003.1221162
by applicantUS6266379
 US20040949372
 US20020261875
 US20050193916
 US20030662872
 US20040875086
 US20040815604
 US20010976170
 US20030739823