Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470370

EP3470370 - MICROPOROUS ZIRCONIUM SILICATE FOR THE TREATMENT OF HYPERKALEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZS Pharma, Inc
508 Wrangler Dr., Suite 100
Coppell, TX 75019-7609 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KEYSER, Donald, Jeffrey
1216 Wyndham Hill Lane
Southlake, TX Texas 76092 / US
02 / GUILLEM, Alvaro, F.
727 Lathrop Street
Lantana, TX Texas 76226 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)AstraZeneca
Milstein Building
Granta Park
Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date18195925.510.02.2012
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201161441893P11.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161441893 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470370
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C01B33/20, A61K33/00, A61K33/24, A61K45/06, A61K9/14, B01J39/02, B01J39/14, B01J19/00, B01J19/18, C07F7/02, C01B39/02, C01B39/46
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIKROPORÖSES ZIRKONSILIKAT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERKALIÄMIE[2019/16]
English:MICROPOROUS ZIRCONIUM SILICATE FOR THE TREATMENT OF HYPERKALEMIA[2019/16]
French:SILICATE DE ZIRCONIUM MICROPOREUX POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERKALÉMIE[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12744254.9  / EP2673237
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO02062356  (ASH MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [Y] 8 * pages 9,10,16 * [A] 1-7
 [XY]  - ANATOLY I. BORTUN ET AL, "Hydrothermal Synthesis of Sodium Zirconium Silicates and Characterization of Their Properties", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (19970310), vol. 9, no. 8, doi:10.1021/cm9701419, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 1854 - 1864, XP055387088 [X] 1-7 * page 1861 - page 1862; figure 15 * [Y] 8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm9701419
by applicantUS6579460
 US6099737
 US6332985
 US6814871
 US5891417
 US5888472