Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468221

EP3468221 - HEADPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.02.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rion Co., Ltd.
20-41, Higashimoto-machi 3-chome
Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ISHIKAWA, Shinichi
RION Co., Ltd.
20-41, Higashimotomachi 3-chome
Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / YAMASAKI, Takashi
RION Co., Ltd.
20-41, Higashimotomachi 3-chome
Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / NAGAMINE, Kenichi
ASHIDA SOUND CO., LTD.
3-4-9 Osaki
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / MANO, Takashi
ASHIDA SOUND CO., LTD.
3-4-9 Osaki
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
Postfach 70 04 25
81304 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18196137.624.09.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateJP2017019450904.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017194509
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468221
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/10, H04R1/28
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOPFHÖRER[2019/15]
English:HEADPHONE[2019/15]
French:CASQUE[2019/15]
Examination procedure24.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2006249  (AKG) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003007660  (TSUNODA NAOTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3112005  (SHAW EDGAR A G, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013343565  (RIDLER BETTINA [DK]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH105197  (RION CO) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Amazon, "AKG K518 LE Kopfhörer rot: Amazon.de: Elektronik", (20091009), URL: https://www.amazon.de/AKG-K518-LE-Kopfhörer-rot/dp/B002F9MFTI, (20190130), XP055549142 [X] 1-4 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Amazon, "LEORX Ein paar von PU Schaum Kopfhörer Ohrpolster Ohrpolster für AKG K518 K518DJ K518LE K81 SONY MDR-NC6: Amazon.de: Baumarkt", (20150916), URL: https://www.amazon.de/dp/B015FHFH00/ref=psdc_1382720031_t1_B07D5GS1LZ, (20190130), XP055549189 [X] 1-4 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2016015691
 JP2011160310