Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471234

EP3471234 - METHOD, APPARATUS, AND DEVICE FOR CHARGING A BATTERY AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited
No. 2, Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian
352100 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ZOU, Qifan
No. 2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
02 / LUO, Fuping
No. 2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
03 / DU, Xinxin
No. 2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
04 / WANG, Shengwei
No. 2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
05 / XU, Wenzhu
No. 2 Xin'gang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date18196361.224.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateCN20171089191727.09.2017         Original published format: CN201710891917
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471234
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, H02J7/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM LADEN EINER BATTERIE UND SPEICHERMEDIUM[2019/16]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS, AND DEVICE FOR CHARGING A BATTERY AND STORAGE MEDIUM[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE CHARGER UNE BATTERIE ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS[2019/16]
Examination procedure16.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/47]
16.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[X]US2017256961  (ZENG YUANQING [CN], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]CN107196371  (CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP2546089  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]CN107204493  (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *