Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470366

EP3470366 - REDUCING VIBRATION OF A MEMS INSTALLATION ON A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi
Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Mäntyoja, Nikolai
Niittysillankulma 2 C 5
02200 Espoo / FI
02 / Kaija, Kimmo
Rautiaisentie 21 H 23
02660 Espoo / FI
03 / Nurmi, Sami
Kuovintie 12
04320 Tuusula / FI
04 / Eskelinen, Jukka
Koskitie 32 A
01800 Klaukkala / FI
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18196462.825.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateFI2017000589812.10.2017         Original published format: FI 20175898
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470366
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B81B7/00, G01P1/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REDUZIERUNG VON VIBRATION EINER MEMS INSTALLATION AUF EINER LEITERPLATTE[2019/16]
English:REDUCING VIBRATION OF A MEMS INSTALLATION ON A PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD[2019/16]
French:RÉDUCTION DES VIBRATIONS D'UNE INSTALLATION MEMS SUR UNE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
25.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
02.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2014091443  (DUCA ROSEANNE [MT], et al) [X] 1,7-9,11,15,16 * figures 3a-3c * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0057] * [A] 2-4,6,12,13 [I] 5,10,14,17;
 [A]EP0711104  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,11 * figure 9 * * column 1 *;
 [A]US2006231949  (PARK CHANG-YONG [KR], et al) [A] 1,11 * figures 11,12 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0054] *