Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470933

EP3470933 - WHEEL TRAIN DEVICE AND TIMEPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KUNIMI, Ryoichi
c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamura R&D Center
2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
02 / ENTA, Yoshihiko
c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
Hamura R&D Center
2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18196476.825.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2017018587727.09.2017         Original published format: JP 2017185877
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470933
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G04B19/02, G04C3/14
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:RADERWERKVORRICHTUNG UND UHR[2019/16]
English:WHEEL TRAIN DEVICE AND TIMEPIECE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE ROUAGE ET PIÈCE D'HORLOGERIE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
25.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0347251  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,7 * column 18, lines 37-55; figures 17,25,28 * * column 10, line 7 - column 12, line 39; figures 10,23,26 * * column 17, line 17 - column 18, line 36 * [A] 2,4-6;
 [X]EP1672437  (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0036] - [0038] - [0048] - [0049] - [0051] , [0058] , [0094] - [9102] - [0104] - [0111] - [0115] - [0125] , [0126]; figures 1-7,10-15, 32,33,38; claims 1,2,5,6-11 * * paragraphs [0076] - [0088] *;
 [A]CH698654  (TECHNOTIME MICROTECHNIQUE SAS [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJP2001324579