Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474341

EP3474341 - COMPOSITE BATTERY CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
25.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 27.11.2019 [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 27.11.2019 [2019/48]
25.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Prologium Technology Co., Ltd.
No.6-1, Ziqiang 7th Rd.
Zhongli Dist.
Taoyuan City 320 / TW
For all designated states
Prologium Holding Inc.
PO Box 309
Ugland House
Grand Cayman, KY1-1104 / KY
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Yang, Szu-Nan
PROLOGIUM TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
No.6-1, Ziqiang 7th Rd., Zhongli Dist.
Taoyuan City / TW
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Lang, Christian
LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei
Ingolstädter Straße 5
80807 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18196727.426.09.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateTW2017013607120.10.2017         Original published format: TW 106136071
[2019/27]
Former [2019/17]TW1063607120.10.2017
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474341
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/02, H01M2/08, H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01M10/04, H01M10/42
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENGESETZTE BATTERIEZELLE[2019/17]
English:COMPOSITE BATTERY CELL[2019/17]
French:CELLULE DE BATTERIE COMPOSITE[2019/17]
Examination procedure18.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
18.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2012005882  (SHIMAMURA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 2-4,16 * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] - [ 140] , [ 141] , [ 145] , [ 154] , [ 158] , [ 159]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 1,2,4 [I] 5-15,17;
 [XY]US2016233694  (KOENEN ROBERT JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 36]; figures 4, 5 * [Y] 1,2,4;
 [Y]US6969567  (HIGLEY LIN R [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 65 * * column 6, line 18 - line 28; figures 1, 2a *
by applicantUS2004091771