Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3474341 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3474341



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 121
21.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.11.2019 Priority search results Search / examination 4
21.11.2019 Priority search results Search / examination 2
21.11.2019 Priority search results Search / examination 5
21.11.2019 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
07.11.2019 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
18.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
18.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.10.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 13
18.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 3
26.02.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
14.02.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
04.10.2018 Priority document Search / examination 32
26.09.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
26.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
26.09.2018 Description Search / examination 11
26.09.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 Drawings Search / examination 11
26.09.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5