Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3474341


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.10.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
25.10.2019 Request for examination filed published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019 Change - designated states published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019 Amendment by applicant
31.05.2019 Change - priority published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
28.09.2018 Change - representative