Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3441323

EP3441323 - POST-MIX BEVERAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pepsico, Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, NY 10577 / US
[2019/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Marina, Carlos Herman
800 Fairway Drive, Suite 400
Deerfield Beach, FL Florida 33441 / US
02 / Ruiz de Gopegui, Ricardo
1040 Brandy Springs Ct.
Forest, VA 24551 / US
03 / Enga, Agnete
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
04 / Ruiz de Gopegui, Vincent
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
05 / Connelly, Tim
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
06 / Cedar, Jonathan
259 11th St
Brooklyn, NY 11215 / US
07 / Fort, Tucker
309 Pacific St
Brookly, NY 11201 / US
 [2019/19]
Former [2019/09]01 / Marina, Carlos Herman
800 Fairway Drive, Suite 400
Deerfield Beach, FL Florida 33441 / US
02 / Ruiz de Gopegui, Ricardo
PepsiCo, Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, NY New York 10577 / US
03 / Enga, Agnete
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
04 / Ruiz de Gopegui, Vincent
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
05 / Connelly, Tim
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
06 / Cedar, Jonathan
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
07 / Fort, Tucker
309 Pacific St
Brookly, NY 11201 / US
Former [2019/07]01 / Marina, Carlos Herman
800 Fairway Drive, Suite 400
Deerfield Beach, FL Florida 33441 / US
02 / Ruiz de Gopegui, Ricardo
PepsiCo, Inc.
700 Anderson Hill Road
Purchase, NY New York 10577 / US
03 / Enga, Agnete
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
04 / Ruiz de Gopegui, Vincent
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
05 / Connelly, Tim
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
06 / Cedar, Jonathan
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
07 / Fort, Tucker
Smart Design
601 W. Street Suite 1820
New York, NY New York 10001 / US
Representative(s)Ledl, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/07]
Application number, filing date18196730.828.08.2009
[2019/07]
Priority number, dateUS20080093090P29.08.2008         Original published format: US 93090 P
US20090146156P21.01.2009         Original published format: US 146156 P
[2019/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3441323
Date:13.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/32, B67D1/00
[2019/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/07]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM FÜR NACHTRÄGLICH GEMISCHTE GETRÄNKE[2019/07]
English:POST-MIX BEVERAGE SYSTEM[2019/07]
French:SYSTÈME DE BOISSONS POST-MÉLANGE[2019/07]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
26.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/07]
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09792074.8  / EP2323923
EP14189872.6  / EP2837580
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006289316  (HENRY JOHN R [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0042] * [I] 2-15;
 [A]US2004211742  (DEANS DAVID M [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022] *