Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467570

EP3467570 - BINOCULAR RIVALRY MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
11.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
11.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thales
TOUR CARPE DIEM
Place des Corolles
Esplanade Nord
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HOURLIER, Sylvain
THALES
75 - 77, Avenue Marcel Dassault
33700 MERIGNAC / FR
02 / AYMERIC, Bruno
THALES
75 - 77, Avenue Marcel Dassault
33700 MERIGNAC / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hnich-Gasri, Naïma , et al
Marks & Clerk France
Immeuble Visium
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18196731.626.09.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateFR2017000103105.10.2017         Original published format: FR 1701031
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467570
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/01
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERUNG DER OKULAREN RIVALITÄT[2019/15]
English:BINOCULAR RIVALRY MANAGEMENT[2019/15]
French:GESTION DE LA RIVALITE OCULAIRE[2019/15]
Examination procedure09.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
09.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2016077345  (BOHAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,14-16 * figures 5, 11, 12, 14 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0 40] * [A] 3,7,11-13 [I] 17;
 [XAI]US2016139432  (MOORE STEPHEN JAMES [US]) [X] 1,2,9,14,15 * figure 1 * * claims 16, 17 * [A] 3,7,11-13 [I] 4-6;
 [XAI]WO2016107921  (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 1,17 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 11 - line 32 * [A] 3,7,11-13 [I] 2,4-6,8-10;
 [A]US5233458  (MOFFITT KIRK W [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * figures 3A-B, 4 *;
 [A]  - PATTERSON R ET AL, "Binocular rivalry and head-worn displays", HUMAN FAC, HUMAN FACTORS AND ERGONOMICS SOCIETY, SANTA MONICA, CA, US, (20071201), vol. 49, no. 6, doi:10.1518/001872007X249947, ISSN 0018-7208, pages 1083 - 1096, XP008166156 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1518/001872007X249947