Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474627

EP3474627 - OPENFLOW-BASED DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
28.06.2019Change - classificationpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
28.06.2019Change - classificationpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOLiD INC
Solid Space
220, Pangyoyeok-ro
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KWON, Dong Hee
No.105-1101, 68, Yonggu-daero 2771beon-gil
Suji-gu, Yongin-si
16865 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / HONG, Hoo Pyo
No.5613-301, 61, Wiryedong-ro, Sujeong-gu
Seongnam-si
13645 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / CHO, Young Man
No.1-403, 31, Sapyeong-daero 28-gil
Seocho-gu
06578 Seoul / KR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18197264.727.09.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateKR2017012792129.09.2017         Original published format: KR 20170127921
[2019/17]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3474627
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3474627
Date:31.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W88/08, H04B7/022, H04L12/715, H04L12/24
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPENFLOW-BASIERTES VERTEILTES ANTENNENSYSTEM[2019/17]
English:OPENFLOW-BASED DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME D'ANTENNE DISTRIBUÉE À BASE DE OPENFLOW[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[I]US2016007205  (HASARCHI ABRAHAM [IL], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0090] *;
 [A]US2016337937  (MCCANN PETER J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] *;
 [I]  - Anonymous, "OpenFlow Switch Specification Version 1.4.0", (20131014), URL: https://www.opennetworking.org/images/stories/downloads/sdn-resources/onf-specifications/openflow/openflow-spec-v1.4.0.pdf, (20190205), XP055551711 [I] 14-17 * Sections 2, 5 *
 [A]  - BERCOVICH DUDU ET AL, "Software-Defined Wireless Transport Networks for Flexible Mobile Backhaul in 5G Systems", MOBILE NETWORKS AND APPLICATIONS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 20, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S11036-015-0635-Y, ISSN 1383-469X, (20150821), pages 793 - 801, (20150821), XP035924161 [A] 14-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11036-015-0635-y