blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3474627 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3474627



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 200
05.08.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
03.07.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.07.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 8
03.07.2019 European search report Search / examination 4
03.07.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.02.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
25.02.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
25.02.2019 Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results Search / examination 7
15.02.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
10.01.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.12.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.12.2018 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
06.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.11.2018 Drawings Search / examination 9
06.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.11.2018 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.10.2018 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
27.09.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.09.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
27.09.2018 Description Search / examination 30
27.09.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.09.2018 Drawings Search / examination 9
27.09.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
27.09.2018 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 43