blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3474627 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201811141918 EP18197264



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2019104072Global Dossier 04.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
KR20170127921 29.09.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101877004BGlobal Dossier 10.07.2018B1
Priority number Date
KR20170127921 29.09.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2019068420Global Dossier 25.04.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20170127921 29.09.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN109586945Global Dossier 05.04.2019A
Priority number Date
KR20170127921 29.09.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3474627Global Dossier 31.07.2019A3
EP3474627 24.04.2019A2
Priority number Date
KR20170127921 29.09.2017