Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466856

EP3466856 - YARN JOINING NOZZLE, YARN JOINING DEVICE, YARN WINDING DEVICE, AND YARN JOINING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Murata Machinery, Ltd.
3 Minami Ochiai-cho
Kisshoin
Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8326 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SAKAMOTO, Naotaka
136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho, Fushimi-ku
Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP
02 / SAWADA, Akira
136, Takeda Mukaishiro-cho, Fushimi-ku
Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Stöckeler, Ferdinand , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18197301.727.09.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateJP2017019328403.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017193284
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466856
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B65H69/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GARNVERBINDUNGSDÜSE, GARNVERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG, GARNWICKELVORRICHTUNG UND GARNVERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/15]
English:YARN JOINING NOZZLE, YARN JOINING DEVICE, YARN WINDING DEVICE, AND YARN JOINING METHOD[2019/15]
French:BUSE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE FIL, DISPOSITIF D'ASSEMBLAGE DE FIL, DISPOSITIF D'ENROULEMENT DE FIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE FIL[2019/15]
Examination procedure08.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
08.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.11.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2020/01]
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4505098  (BABA SUSUMU [JP]) [X] 1,8-11 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 3 * * column 5, lines 48-60; figure - * [A] 2,3,5-7 [Y] 4;
 [XY]DE4019959  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8-11 * column 1, lines 40-59 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 34; figure -; claim 1 * [Y] 4;
 [X]JPH11106147  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [X] 1,8-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US3306020  (NATHAN ROSENSTEIN) [A] 2,3 * column 2, lines 67-70; figure - *;
 [A]DE4232027  (MESDAN SPA [IT]) [A] 5-7 * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 34; figure - *;
 [A]US4452035  (ROHNER JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 5-7 * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 7; figure - *
by applicantJPH07125932