Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466613

EP3466613 - WORKPIECE CONVEYING APPARATUS FOR A PRESSING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
11.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
11.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aida Engineering Ltd.
2-10 Ohyama-cho
Midori-ku
Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa 252-5181 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Takeda, Keisuke
c/o AIDA ENGINEERING, LTD.
2-10, Ohyama-cho, Midori-ku, Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa, 252-5181 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Grosse, Felix Christopher
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18197559.028.09.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateJP2017019588906.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017195889
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466613
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/00, B25J9/04, B25J19/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WERKSTÜCKFÖRDERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE PRESSMASCHINE[2019/15]
English:WORKPIECE CONVEYING APPARATUS FOR A PRESSING MACHINE[2019/15]
French:APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT DE PIÈCES DE MACHINE DESTINÉES À UNE PRESSE[2019/15]
Examination procedure08.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
08.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XAY]JPS61297096  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,4,6 * figures 1-5 * [A] 5,7 [Y] 3;
 [YA]JPS63191583  (PENTEL KK) [Y] 3 * figure 1 * [A] 1,2,4,6;
 [X]JPS61249295  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,4,6 * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]JP2012000740  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,4,6 * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [A]JPH0460692U  (PATENTEE UNKNOWN) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]JP4241589B  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2,4,6 * figures 1-8 *
by applicantJP2009208080