Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3505162 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3505162



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 368
08.07.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.06.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
05.06.2019 European search report Search / examination 3
05.06.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.05.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
21.12.2018 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
19.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.12.2018 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 2
14.12.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
16.10.2018 Invitation to file claims Search / examination 1
01.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.10.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
01.10.2018 Description Search / examination 123
01.10.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
01.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 1
01.10.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
06.03.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 98
06.03.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 105