Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3505162


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.09.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.05.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
19.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2018 Change - representative