Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3505162

EP3505162 - USE OF BINDERS FOR MANUFACTURING STORAGE STABLE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Euro-Celtique S.A.
1, rue Jean Piret
2350 Luxembourg / LU
[2019/27]
Inventor(s)01 / PRATER, Derek Allan
28 Pearson Close
Milton Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB24 6YS / GB
02 / SPITZLEY, Christof
Am Linsengraben 2
65627 Elbtal / DE
03 / HEUN, Gerhard Josef
Limburgerstraße 80
65611 Brechen / DE
04 / SCHÜTZ, Alexander
Oranienstraße 6A
65597 Hünfelden Nauheim / DE
05 / HAHN, Udo
Nordstraße 1
56412 Nentershausen / DE
06 / LEUNER, Christian
Blauwiesenweg 65
60439 Frankfurt / DE
 [2019/27]
Representative(s)Ledl, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/27]
Application number, filing date18197869.311.08.2011
[2019/27]
Priority number, dateUS201037334410P13.08.2010         Original published format: US 37334410 P
EP2010017275913.08.2010         Original published format: EP 10172759
[2019/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3505162
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K31/485
[2019/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON BINDUNGSMITTELN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LAGERUNGSSTABILEN FORMULIERUNGEN[2019/27]
English:USE OF BINDERS FOR MANUFACTURING STORAGE STABLE FORMULATIONS[2019/27]
French:UTILISATION DE LIANTS POUR LA FABRICATION DE FORMULATIONS STABLES AU STOCKAGE[2019/27]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11743537.0  / EP2603205
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
17.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1695700  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU]) [A] 1-13 * example 2; table 7 * * claims 1,23 *;
 [Y]EP1604667  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0049]; claims 1,8,10 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1,9 *;
 [XY]WO03007802  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11,12 * example 2; table 2 * [Y] 1-13;
 [Y]US2003068392  (SACKLER RICHARD [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0155] , [0215] * * example 1 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]  - Rote Liste Service Gmbh, "Targin", Rote Liste, EDITIO VERLAG,, (20100101), pages 2pp, 364 - 365, XP055264280 [X] 1-13 * Targin 5mg/2,5mg *
by applicantUS4705695