Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466776

EP3466776 - ELECTROMECHANICAL, ACTIVE DUAL-REDUNDANCY, TWIN-MOTOR ACTUATOR TO OPERATE A COMPONENT OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2019
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Magneti Marelli S.p.A.
Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63
20011 Corbetta (MI) / IT
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PEZZOTTA, Federico
Contrada Piscone, 4
86036 MONTENERO DI BISACCIA (CB) / IT
02 / MUSOLESI, Stefano
Viale della Repubblica, 50
40017 SAN GIOVANNI IN PERSICETO (BO) / IT
03 / GAROFALO, Michele
Via Quintino Sella, 12
86100 CAMPOBASSO / IT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Musconi, Roberta , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18198076.402.10.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateIT2017011258106.10.2017         Original published format: IT201700112581
[2019/15]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466776
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60T1/00, B60T1/06, B60T13/74, H02K7/116, H02K16/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMECHANISCHER, AKTIVER, ZWEIFACH REDUNDANTER, ZWEIMOTORIGER AKTUATOR ZUM BETREIBEN EINER KOMPONENTE EINES FAHRZEUGS[2019/15]
English:ELECTROMECHANICAL, ACTIVE DUAL-REDUNDANCY, TWIN-MOTOR ACTUATOR TO OPERATE A COMPONENT OF A VEHICLE[2019/15]
French:ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE À DOUBLE MOTEUR ET À DOUBLE REDONDANCE POUR ACTIONNER LE COMPOSANT D'UN VÉHICULE[2019/15]
Examination procedure09.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
09.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[YA]CN101559766  (CHERY AUTOMOBILE CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 5 * abstract * [A] 1-4,6-10;
 [A]CN204627210U  (KUNSHAN MAGNA AUTOMOBILE SYSTEM CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2004254040  (SOMSCHOR BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034]; figure - *;
 [IY]JPH02273051  (HINO MOTORS LTD) [I] 1,2,10 * the whole document * [Y] 3-9;
 [Y]US2009078898  (SASAKI KAZUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2014021808  (PALFENIER SAMUEL R [US], et al) [Y] 6-9 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0036]; figure - *;
 [A]US2005184265  (AOKI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0341] - paragraph [0355]; figures 31-34 *
by applicantCN101559766