Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3470738 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3470738



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 70
05.11.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.02.2019 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 Priority document Search / examination 31
14.02.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.02.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 3
14.02.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
14.02.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
02.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.10.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
02.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
02.10.2018 Description Search / examination 9
02.10.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.10.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 3
02.10.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5