Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467647

EP3467647 - GENERATING CHECKSUMS ON TRUSTED STORAGE DEVICES FOR ACCELERATED AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harman International Industries, Incorporated
400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor
Stamford, CT 06901 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HAASE, Robert
2185 S Hacker Rd
Brighton, MI, 48114 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Bertsch, Florian Oliver
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18198140.802.10.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS20171572587805.10.2017         Original published format: US201715725878
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467647
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F8/65, G06F21/57, H04L9/30, H04L9/32, H04L29/06, H04W12/06, H04W4/70
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERZEUGUNG VON PRÜFSUMMEN AUF VERTRAUTEN SPEICHERVORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BESCHLEUNIGTEN AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG[2019/15]
English:GENERATING CHECKSUMS ON TRUSTED STORAGE DEVICES FOR ACCELERATED AUTHENTICATION[2019/15]
French:GÉNÉRATION DE SOMMES DE CONTRÔLE SUR DES DISPOSITIFS DE STOCKAGE DE CONFIANCE POUR AUTHENTIFICATION ACCÉLÉRÉE[2019/15]
Examination procedure10.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/47]
10.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2015261521  (CHOI HYUKSANG [KR], et al) [X] 8,10-13 * page 6, paragraph 103; figures 1-4 * * page 7, paragraph 109 - paragraph 116 * * page 1, paragraph 7 * * page 4, paragraph 77 * * page 5, paragraph 87 * [Y] 1-7,9,14-19;
 [Y]US2013185548  (DJABAROV GUEORGUI [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,9,14-19 * page 4, paragraph 39 * * page 5, paragraph 60 *