Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471009

EP3471009 - FORWARD AND BACKWARD NIAP MIGRATION OF CERTIFICATE STORES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ALP, Maxim
4701 Tahoe Blvd.
Mississauga, Ontario L4W 0B5 / CA
02 / MUELLER, Michael J.
4701 Tahoe Blvd.
Mississauga, Ontario L4W 0B5 / CA
03 / TILEUBAY, Janseyit
22 Elkhorn Dr., Apt. 436
Toronto, Ontario M2K 1J4 / CA
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18198173.902.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20171572923210.10.2017         Original published format: US201715729232
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471009
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/60, G06F21/64
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORWÄRTS- UND RÜCKWÄRTS-NIAP-MIGRATION VON ZERTIFIKATSSPEICHERN[2019/16]
English:FORWARD AND BACKWARD NIAP MIGRATION OF CERTIFICATE STORES[2019/16]
French:MIGRATION NIAP VERS L'AVANT ET VERS L'ARRIÈRE DE LISTES DE CERTIFICATS[2019/16]
Examination procedure10.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/47]
10.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Documents cited:Search[A]US2014213217  (HO ALAN PAK-LUN [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0080] *;
 [A]EP2725511  (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] *
 [I]  - Anonymous, "Move Certificate to Another Certificate Store", (20160617), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160617092649/https://www.digicert.com/move-certificate-to-another-certificate-store.htm, (20190208), XP055554106 [I] 1-12 * page 1, line 2 - line 15 *