EP3466562 - PRINTING-ENHANCED CASTING CORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Wayde R. 7 Amberg Drive Pomfret Centre, CT Connecticut 06259 / US | 02 /
SHEEDY, Paul 32 Anthony Road Bolton, CT Connecticut 06043 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18198443.6 | 03.10.2018 | [2019/15] | Priority number, date | US201715723591 | 03.10.2017 Original published format: US201715723591 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3466562 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/10, B22C9/24, F01D5/18, F01D5/20 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B22C9/103 (EP,US);
B22C9/10 (EP,US);
B22C9/12 (EP,US);
B22C9/24 (EP,US);
B28B7/346 (US);
F01D25/12 (US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D11/08 (US);
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F02C7/12 (US);
F05D2230/10 (US);
F05D2230/211 (EP,US);
F05D2230/22 (EP,US);
F05D2230/30 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] |
Former [2019/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKVEREDELTE GUSSKERNE | [2019/15] | English: | PRINTING-ENHANCED CASTING CORES | [2019/15] | French: | NOYAUX DE COULÉE AMÉLIORÉS PAR IMPRESSION | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 10.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1543896 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0011] , [0012] , [0021] , [0022] , [0023] , [0025] , [0028] , [0032] - [0034]; figures 1-2 * [I] 4-10,12-14; | [XI]EP1652601 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,11,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] , [0005] , [0006] , [0009] , [0016] , [0017] , [0018] , [0019] , [0020] , [0024]; figure 1 * [I] 4-10,12-14; | [XI]EP1652602 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,11,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] , [0005] , [0006] , [0010] , [0015] , [0016] , [0020] , [0021] , [0023]; figure 1 * [I] 4-10,12-14; | [XI]US2007235157 (BUNKER RONALD S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] , [0013] , [0018] , [0035] , [0040] - [0043] - [0049] , [0053] , [0062]; figures 2,3 *[I] 4-10; | [XI]US2016017724 (XU JINQUAN [US]) [X] 1-3,11-14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0033]; figures 1-3 * [I] 4-10 |