Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468031

EP3468031 - SOUND-EMITTING ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
03.05.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
03.05.2019Change - designated statespublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Foundation Brakes France SAS
126 Rue de Stalingrad
93700 Drancy / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / AYACHE, Marc
35 rue de Clery
75002 PARIS / FR
02 / PASQUET, Thierry
1 Boulevard de la Libération
94700 VINCENNES / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)LLR
11, boulevard de Sébastopol
75001 Paris / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18198515.103.10.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateFR2017005938906.10.2017         Original published format: FR 1759389
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468031
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:H02P31/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄUSCHERZEUGENDER ELEKTROMOTOR[2019/15]
English:SOUND-EMITTING ELECTRIC MOTOR[2019/15]
French:MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ÉMETTEUR DE SON[2019/15]
Examination procedure23.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
23.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE102012211689  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2012130580  (OMOTE ASAKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0103]; figure 10 *;
 [Y]EP0360210  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 2 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 40; figures 8-10 *;
 [Y]US2010096224  (KIM JOO GON [KR]) [Y] 7,8,12 * abstract *;
 [A]US2002067084  (JUNG PHILIPP [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102013215846  (BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *