Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467579

EP3467579 - LED MODULE SEAM ILLUMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Christie Digital Systems USA, Inc.
10550 Camden Drive
Cypress, CA 90630 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Adema, Daniel Robert
225 Black Walnut Place
Kitchener, Ontario N2P 1T5 / CA
02 / Hemphill, Bryan Russell
727 Munich Circle
Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2N6 / CA
03 / Lemieux, Marc
30 Caroll Crescent
Guelph, Ontario N1G 5B5 / CA
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18198660.504.10.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS20171572571605.10.2017         Original published format: US201715725716
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467579
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1333, H01L27/32
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LED-MODUL-NAHTBELEUCHTUNG[2019/15]
English:LED MODULE SEAM ILLUMINATION[2019/15]
French:ÉCLAIRAGE DE JOINT DE MODULE À DEL[2019/15]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
10.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[IY]CN202285170U  (YONGJING WANG) [I] 1,2,4-15 * abstract * * paragraph [Embodiment_one] * * paragraph [Background_technology] * [Y] 3;
 [YA]US2010123384  (MILLER MICHAEL E [US], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract * * paragraph [0060] * [A] 1,2,4-15