Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470346

EP3470346 - TILTABLE LID ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.06.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lifetime Brands, Inc.
1000 Stewart Avenue
Garden City, NY 11530 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Cozzolino, Steven C
c/o Lifetime Brands
1000 Stewart AVenue
Garden City, NY New York 11530 / US
02 / Treacy, Lyndon
c/o Lifetime Brands
1000 Stewart Avenue
Garden City, NY New York 11530 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Harding, Andrew Philip
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Johnson, Emma Elizabeth
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date18198689.404.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20171572666306.10.2017         Original published format: US201715726663
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470346
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B65D47/24, B65D47/20
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/31]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KIPPBARE DECKELANORDNUNG[2019/16]
English:TILTABLE LID ASSEMBLY[2019/16]
French:ENSEMBLE DE COUVERCLE A BASCULE[2019/16]
Examination procedure24.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/31]
24.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Documents cited:Search[XAI]EP2103539  (DART IND INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,9,11 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1, 4, 5, 7 * [A] 12 [I] 10;
 [XAI]US5579961  (ZIMMERMAN LARRY G [US]) [X] 1,2,9,11 * column 2, line 6 - line 44; figures 6-7 * [A] 12 [I] 10