Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469949

EP3469949 - WALL UNIT WITH MOBILE FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
20.09.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - designated statespublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compagnucci High Tech S.R.L.
Via Scarpara Alta, 57
60030 Santa Maria Nuova (AN) / IT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CIATTAGLIA, Daniele
Via P.P. Agabiti, 10/bis
60035 Jesi (AN) / IT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Baldi, Claudio
Ing. Claudio Baldi S.r.l.
Viale Cavallotti, 13
60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18198767.805.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateIT20170113987U10.10.2017         Original published format: IT 201700113987 U
[2019/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469949
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:A47B46/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/43]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WANDELEMENT MIT MOBILEM RAHMEN[2019/16]
English:WALL UNIT WITH MOBILE FRAME[2019/16]
French:UNITÉ DE PAROI À CADRE MOBILE[2019/16]
Examination procedure11.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/43]
11.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2005168680  (MATSUKINRII KK) [X] 1-3,9,10 * figures 3-6 *;
 [XI]JPS6423231U  (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,2,9,10 * figures 1-4 * [I] 3;
 [XI]WO9423612  (HAGON JEFFREY RICHARD [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * figures 6-12 * [I] 3