Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471196

EP3471196 - DISC-SHAPED ADVERTISING SUPPORT FOR ARRANGING ON A PARABOLIC ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - designated statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fansat GmbH
Brüsseler Strasse 5
65552 Limburg / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BORN, Ulrich
Brahmsstraße 19
63225 Langen / DE
02 / GABB, Andreas
Schubertstraße 23
65551 Limburg / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Müller, Eckhard
Mühlstrasse 9a
65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18198774.405.10.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateDE20171012399816.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017123998
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471196
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/12, H01Q1/42, H01Q19/12, G09F7/18, G09F23/00, // H01Q19/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHEIBENFÖRMIGER WERBETRÄGER ZUR ANORDNUNG AN EINER PARABOLANTENNE[2019/16]
English:DISC-SHAPED ADVERTISING SUPPORT FOR ARRANGING ON A PARABOLIC ANTENNA[2019/16]
French:SUPPORT PUBLICITAIRE EN FORME DE DISQUE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE AGENCÉ SUR UNE ANTENNE PARABOLIQUE[2019/16]
Examination procedure31.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
31.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2470412  (BROWN STEPHEN CRAIG [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 29; figures 3-8 *;
 [X]US2009295677  (GRATTON MAX S [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028]; figure 4 *;
 [X]US2007069972  (HOGSETT SAMUEL W [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-4,8,9 *;
 [A]  - A Anonymous, "T50SOSEC5 T50SOS Cable Tie With EC5 Mount", Datasheet, (20110428), pages 1 - 3, URL: www.digikey.com, (20190305), XP055564502 [A] 1-15 * page 1 *
 [A]  - A Anonymous, "Mounting Base (4 Way) MB3 & MB3A", Datasheet, (20100412), page 1, URL: www.digikey.com, (20190305), XP055564507 [A] 1-15 * page 1 *