Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473930

EP3473930 - NOZZLE FOR A COMBUSTION CHAMBER OF AN ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.12.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
06.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG
Eschenweg 11
15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DAUCH, Thilo
Kolberger Str. 12d
76139 Karlsruhe / DE
02 / KOCH, Rainer
Gärtenwiesen 8
76646 Bruchsal / DE
03 / BAUER, Hans-Jörg
Habsburgerstr. 19
75177 Pforzheim / DE
04 / DÖRR, Thomas
c/o Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG
Eschenweg 11
15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE
05 / BAKE, Sebastian
c/o Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG
Eschenweg11
15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18198872.605.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE20171021852917.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017218529
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473930
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:F23R3/14, F23R3/28
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DÜSE FÜR EINE BRENNKAMMER EINES TRIEBWERKS[2019/17]
English:NOZZLE FOR A COMBUSTION CHAMBER OF AN ENGINE[2019/17]
French:BUSE POUR UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION D'UN PROPULSEUR[2019/17]
Examination procedure23.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
23.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2014338353  (MILOSAVLJEVIC VLADIMIR DUSAN [SE]) [X] 1,2,7,10,14,15 * page 3, paragraph 36 - page 4, paragraph 61 * * figures 2, 3, 5A, 5B * [I] 3-6,9,11;
 [XI]DE2544361  (PARKER HANNIFIN CORP) [X] 1,2,7,14,15 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * figures 2, 3 * [I] 8;
 [X]US4941617  (RUSSELL SID [US]) [X] 1,2,7,14,15 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 32 * * figures 1, 3A, 3B *;
 [X]US2007028619  (SPOONER MICHAEL P [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, paragraphs 43-47 * * page 3, paragraphs 51-58 * * figures 1, 3, 4 *