Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473746

EP3473746 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CHEMICAL VAPOR INFILTRATION AND DENSIFICATION OF POROUS SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
4 Coliseum Centre
2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / POLICANDRIOTES, Tod
1467 East Street North
Suffield, CT 06078 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date18198926.005.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171572562005.10.2017         Original published format: US201715725620
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473746
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/04, C23C16/44, C23C16/26, C23C16/32, C23C16/455
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR CHEMISCHEN DAMPFINFILTRATION UND VERDICHTUNG VON PORÖSEN SUBSTRATEN[2019/17]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CHEMICAL VAPOR INFILTRATION AND DENSIFICATION OF POROUS SUBSTRATES[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'INFILTRATION CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR ET DE DENSIFICATION DE SUBSTRATS POREUX[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2016281218  (POLICANDRIOTES TOD J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0021] , [0026] , [0027] , [0044] , [0047] , [0053] , [0055] , [0073]; figure 1; claims 1-12 * [Y] 3,7,8,15;
 [Y]US2002031655  (SUPLINSKAS RAYMOND J [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0009] , [0022]; figure 1; claims 1-3 *;
 [Y]US6863019  (SHAMOUILIAN SHAMOUIL [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 5, line 36 - line 39 *;
 [Y]EP0480581  (APPLIED SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY I [US]) [Y] 15 * column 4, line 24 - line 40; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2009120286  (SCHMID DIETER [DE], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0034] - [0040]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2009238966  (LA FOREST MARK L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-16 *;
 [A]US2006151912  (BAUER DIETER [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-18 *