Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467491

EP3467491 - FLUID FLOW MEASURING DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FT Technologies (UK) Ltd
Sunbury House
Brooklands Close
Sunbury on Thames, TW16 7DX / GB
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KINCEL, Michael
c/o FT Technologies (UK) Ltd
Sunbury House
Brooklands Close
Sunbury-on-Thames, TW16 7DX / GB
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date18198967.405.10.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateGB2017001627705.10.2017         Original published format: GB 201716277
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467491
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/032, G01N29/036, G01F1/66
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLUIDDURCHFLUSSMESSVORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN[2019/15]
English:FLUID FLOW MEASURING DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED METHOD[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MESURE D'ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ[2019/15]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
10.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5877416  (KAPARTIS SAVVAS [GB]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2140160  (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * figure 5 *