Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467524

EP3467524 - SENSOR INTERFACES, SENSOR ARRANGEMENTS, AND OPEN CIRCUIT DETECTION METHODS FOR SENSOR INTERFACES AND ARRANGEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
05.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation
Four Coliseum Centre
2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PETERSEN, Eric
16634 South 2nd Place
Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US
02 / EBERTS, Chris
921 N. Adams Ct.
Chandler, AZ 85225 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date18199088.808.10.2018
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS20171572735606.10.2017         Original published format: US201715727356
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467524
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/28, G01R31/02
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SENSORSCHNITTSTELLEN, SENSORANORDNUNGEN UND LEERLAUFERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SENSORSCHNITTSTELLEN UND ANORDNUNGEN[2019/15]
English:SENSOR INTERFACES, SENSOR ARRANGEMENTS, AND OPEN CIRCUIT DETECTION METHODS FOR SENSOR INTERFACES AND ARRANGEMENTS[2019/15]
French:INTERFACES DE CAPTEUR, AGENCEMENTS DE CAPTEUR ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION DE CIRCUIT OUVERT POUR INTERFACES DE CAPTEUR ET AGENCEMENTS[2019/15]
Examination procedure08.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
08.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[A]US3944288  (BERTOLASI ROBERT B) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, paragraph 35; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US5352938  (WISE WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 43; figures 2a,2b *;
 [A]US4143926  (MILLER ROGER L) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 10 *;
 [A]CN105686884  (QIU YANMING) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2001035723  (PELRINE RONALD E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0185] - paragraph [0191]; figures 6D,6E *;
 [AD]US4166243  (MORETTI JOHN A [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *
by applicantUS4166243
 US8274238