Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3467524 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3467524



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 99
08.10.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
08.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 6
08.10.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 Description Search / examination 14
08.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
08.10.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
08.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.12.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
02.01.2019 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
15.02.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
15.02.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
15.02.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 1
15.02.2019 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 8
15.02.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
15.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.10.2019 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 1
08.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1